Boardman v. Rehman
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sean F Cox |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10949 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*
Wed 04/17 10:45 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) |
|
6 | 6
order
Directing Service by the US Marshal
Wed 04/17 8:37 AM
ORDER directing service without prepayment of costs and authorizing the US Marshal to collect costs after service is made. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/17 10:46 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Robert Alan Boardman 857600, GUS HARRISON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 2727 E. BEECHER STREET, ADRIAN, MI 49221 (JMcC) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Tue 04/16 10:09 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Mon 04/15 11:46 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $2.35 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (MCho) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Mediation Program*
Fri 04/12 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (MCho) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Fri 04/12 11:54 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Robert Alan Boardman. (MCho) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Robert Alan Boardman against Rehman (MCho) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |