Simpson v. Artis
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Judith E Levy |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-10954 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/11 10:01 AM
MOTION to Dismiss DUPLICATIVE PETITION WITH PREJUDICE AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT, with Certificate of Service by Fredeane Artis. (Shimkus, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/11 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Robert Shimkus on behalf of Fredeane Artis. (Shimkus, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/20 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Christensen-Brown on behalf of Fredeane Artis. (Christensen-Brown, Andrea) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Requiring Responsive Pleading*
Thu 05/30 8:36 AM
ORDER Requiring Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 11/29/2024 Reply due by 1/13/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Thu 05/30 8:35 AM
ORDER granting5 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 04/30 2:04 PM
APPLICATION to proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Deonta Duwand Simpson. (DPer) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Correct Deficiency - Habeas and 1983 Complaints Only
Wed 04/17 8:45 AM
ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee and/or application to proceed in forma pauperis. Correction due by 5/8/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
3 | 3
order
Amending Case Caption
Wed 04/17 8:43 AM
Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Tue 04/16 10:21 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/12 5:56 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Deonta Duwand Simpson against Jordan. (MCho) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |