MURPHY et al v. MAYORKAS et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01061 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
UR M. JADDOU
|
|
Defendant
MAYORKAS
|
|
Plaintiff
LUCAS EDWARD MURPHY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MONICA CAMILA ORTIZ PAI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 04/15 3:07 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mg) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Mon 04/15 2:11 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by LUCAS EDWARD MURPHY, MONICA CAMILA ORTIZ PAI.(Pastrana, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons, Director Jaddou USCIS, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons, Secretary Mayorkas DHS, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons, US Attorney DC | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 04/15 9:16 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 9:15 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmw) |
||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Mon 04/15 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 7:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10826096) filed by LUCAS EDWARD MURPHY, MONICA CAMILA ORTIZ PAI.(Pastrana, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Civil Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT H |