CAMIRE et al v. ALCOA USA CORP. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Loren L Alikhan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01062 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
ALCOA BENEFITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
|
|
Defendant
ALCOA CORP.
|
|
Defendant
ALCOA USA CORP.
|
|
Defendant
FIDUCIARY COUNSELORS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM F. OPLINGER
|
|
Plaintiff
MARTHA BRENNAN CAMIRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CRAIG JEFFERSON
|
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL SCHIPPER
|
|
Plaintiff
DAVID LYN SHEPHERD
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 5:07 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean E. Soyars, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10873030. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARTHA BRENNAN CAMIRE. (Mann, Lawrence) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 5:01 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kurt C Struckhoff, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10873006. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARTHA BRENNAN CAMIRE. (Mann, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 4:55 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jerome J. Schlichter, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10872843. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARTHA BRENNAN CAMIRE. (Mann, Lawrence) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 5:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' First Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice3 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and JEROME J. SCHLICHTER is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civ. R. 83.6. Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/3/2024. (lclla1) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 6:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' First Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and KURT C. STRUCKHOFF is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civ. R. 83.6. Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/3/2024. (lclla1) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/03 6:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' First Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and SEAN E. SOYARS is granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civ. R. 83.6. Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 5/3/2024. (lclla1) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:22 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ALCOA BENEFITS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE, ALCOA CORP., ALCOA USA CORP., FIDUCIARY COUNSELORS, INC., WILLIAM F. OPLINGER.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 9:20 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (znmw) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
51
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 6:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10826117) filed by MARTHA BRENNAN CAMIRE.(Mann, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons |