Flanders v. Tipton et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Corrigan |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Mon 04/15 8:29 AM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/15/2024. (HAI) (HAI) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in support
Fri 04/12 4:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re1 Complaint filed by Lavont Flanders, Jr.(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lavont Flanders, Jr.(No IFP and no service copies provided)(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope |