Gibson v. Idleberg et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00683 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 05/02 11:06 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date on this Order, Plaintiff shall either file a fully completed Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate ("Prisoner Consent Form") (if Plaintiff desires to proceed as a pauper) or pay the $405.00 filing fee (if Plaintiff does not wish to proceed as a pauper). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate along with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/1/2024. (DS) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/01 3:13 PM
NOTICE of filing Inmate Banking Account Funds by Courtney Gibson re2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Inquiry
Wed 05/01 3:11 PM
NOTICE of inquiry by Courtney Gibson. Clerk responded with courtesy copy of docket sheet.(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 1:49 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Courtney Gibson.(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Unsigned IFP, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate provided to the Inmate Bank officials to be completed. | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Courtney Gibson.(2 service copies provided)(EAM) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope |