Gomez v. Foremost Insurance Company
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William M Ray, II |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00099 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Foremost Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 10:34 AM
ORDER granting3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Foremost Insurance Company Answer due 5/3/2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/20/2024. (tmf) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 12:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Foremost Insurance Company.(Savrin, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/18 1:52 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Foremost Insurance Company. (Savrin, Philip) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Foremost Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13359508)(tmf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |