Macey v. State of Maryland et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah K Chasanow |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01073 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Elliott Hunter on behalf of Maryland Attorney General, Warden of JCI (Hunter, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 3:03 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to add Warden of JCI as a Respondent; dismissing Respondents State of Maryland and United States District Court; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing that Respondents shall file a Answer to the Petition on or before 40 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/17/2024. (c/m p 4/17/24, c/em as directed 4/17/24 ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Notification Letter
Fri 04/12 1:38 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Teddy Allan Macey. (c/m p 4/12/24 ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 1:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teddy Allan Macey (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/12 1:36 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teddy Allan Macey. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |