Treece v. Truitt et al
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Dever, III |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00213 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Andrew Houlihan
|
|
Defendant
Erin Hucks
|
|
Defendant
Kody H. Kinsley
|
|
Defendant
Wendy Maynard
|
|
Defendant
Vaughn Monroe
|
|
Defendant
Catherine Perry
|
|
Defendant
Jeffery Stout
|
|
Defendant
Catherine Truitt
|
|
Defendant
Terry Vaughn
|
|
Plaintiff
Warren Britt Treece
5541-B Kaplan Dr.
Raleigh, NC 27606 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Fri 04/12 11:47 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Mann, Stephanie) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Fri 04/12 6:44 AM
Letter from Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court to Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 6:41 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 6:39 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Self-Representation
Fri 04/12 6:38 AM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Warren Britt Treece (No date or signature). (Rudd, D.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 6:36 AM
Bill for Breach of Private Equitable Trust Relief against All Defendants, filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |