Treece v. Kinsley et al
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James C Dever, III |
Referred: | Brian S Meyers |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00215 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kody Kinsley
|
|
Defendant
Vaughn S. Monroe
|
|
Plaintiff
Warren Britt Treece
5541-B Kaplan Dr.
Raleigh, NC 27606 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Fri 04/12 1:46 PM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Mann, Stephanie) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Fri 04/12 7:33 AM
Letter from Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court to Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 7:27 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Self-Representation
Fri 04/12 7:27 AM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Warren Britt Treece (Not dated or signed). (Rudd, D.) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 7:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 7:25 AM
Bill in Equity for Suit of Exoneration against Kody Kinsley, Vaughn S. Monroe, filed by Warren Britt Treece. (Rudd, D.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |