Miller v. United States of America
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence W Boyle |
Referred: | Kimberly A Swank |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-00348 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Camp Lejeune Justice Act of 2022 |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice to Counsel
Mon 04/15 8:32 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Sellers, N.) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/15 8:33 AM
DISREGARD. It appears that attorney Segars has been admitted to the EDNC, therefore, no additional local counsel signature is necessary. NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1(d), all parties "must be represented by at least one member of the bar of this court who shall sign all documents filed". It does not appear that local counsel has signed the complaint. Plaintiff shall have local counsel sign the complaint along with out-of-district counsel and re-file. (Sellers, N.) Modified on 4/15/2024 (Sellers, N.) |
||
service
Notice of Camp Lejeune Justice Act Case
Mon 04/15 8:37 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Sellers, N.) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 5:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by James R. Segars, III on behalf of Eddie Miller. (Segars, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT Eddie Miller, Individually, on behalf of all Wrongful Death Beneficiaries, and as Personal Representative of James Miller, Deceased against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7565997.), filed by Eddie Miller. (Segars, James) |