SPRAUVE v. UNKNOWN OFFICIAL AT DURHAM COUNTY DETENTION CENTER et al
North Carolina Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta C Biggs |
Referred: | L Patrick Auld |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00320 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Mailing Recommendation
Mon 04/29 3:47 PM
Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2024. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 5/16/2024. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/29 3:44 PM
ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 4/29/2024; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff § 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper § 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above and states a proper claim for relief. (sh) |
|
utility
Case Referred for Screening
Mon 04/29 10:58 AM
CASE REFERRED for Screening (cb) |
||
order
Order
Mon 04/29 3:45 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 4/29/2024; that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering2 Order and Recommendation. (sh) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 04/12 2:20 PM
Case Assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (cb) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT against UNKNOWN, UNKNOWN OFFICIAL AT DURHAM COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, filed by JON C. SPRAUVE.(cb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope - Front and Back |