Worldpay, LLC v. Pirch, Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Pirch, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Worldpay, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Remand to Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas per7 Agreed Order Remanding case to State Court. (kkz) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 04/19 1:59 PM
AGREED ORDER Remanding Case to State Court. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/19/2024. (kkz) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 04/19 2:07 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (kkz) |
||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 04/19 3:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 4/19/2024; Stephen Weigand, Jason Palmer, and Frank White appeared for Plaintiff; Bradley McPeek appeared for Defendant; parties agree to submit an order to the Court to remand case back to State Court. (kkz) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 04/18 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 4/18/2024; Stephen Weigand, Jason Palmer, Morgan Harrison, and Frank White appeared for Plaintiff; Bradley McPeek appeared for Defendant; Carrie Russell appeared as in-house counsel for Plaintiff; matter discussed regarding6 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court; a follow-up Status Conference is set for 4/19/2024 at 11:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 4/17/2024 for conferencing instructions. (kkz) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 04/17 9:35 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Worldpay, LLC. (Weigand, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Charles Keller | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 04/15 2:16 PM
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct or in the Alternative Dissolve, Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Pirch, Inc.. (McPeek, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mekall Kaltenbach | ||
4 | 4
notice
Clerks Notice to Pro Hac Vice Attorney
Mon 04/15 10:51 AM
Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Frank N. White and Morgan E. M. Harrison. (eh) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT originally filed 4/9/2024 in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. A2401595) by Worldpay, LLC against Pirch, Inc. (eh) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A-D | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 04/15 10:30 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 04/12 7:50 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct or in the Alternative Dissolve, Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Pirch, Inc.. (McPeek, Bradley) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas, case number A2401595 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9918086), filed by Pirch, Inc.. (McPeek, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 69 pgs Exhibit 1 - Copies of Hamilton County pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |