LYLES v. GREYHOUND BUS LINES et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kai N Scott |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01524 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY
|
|
Defendant
GREYHOUND BUS LINES
|
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL SHEAR LYLES
QP-3377 SCI-WAYMART P.O. BOX 256 ROUTE 6
WAYMART, PA 18472 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 04/16 8:22 AM
DOC. NO.3 ALONG WITH IFP APPLICATION MAILED TO PRO SE ON 4/16/24. (amas) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Pro Se Civil Admin Order 7
Mon 04/15 10:30 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING SUBMITTED COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH A CERTIFIED COPY OF THE PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 4/15/24. 4/15/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(bw) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 04/12 2:01 PM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 2 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
Fri 04/12 2:01 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against ALLIED UNIVERSAL SECURITY, GREYHOUND BUS LINES, filed by MICHAEL SHEAR LYLES. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw) |