Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Anita B Brody
Case #: 2:24-cv-01535
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC
1306 Concourse Drive Suite 201
Linthicum Heights, MD 21090
Represented By
JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC
1306 Concourse Drive Suite 201
Linthicum Heights, MD 21090
Represented By
JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Vincent Bradley
CEO 1306 Concourse Drive Suite 201
Linthicum Heights, MD 21090
Represented By
JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C.
Represented By
JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Robert J. Willard
Represented By
JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Lynn Vail
MD 95 Addis Drive
Churchville, PA 18966
Represented By
MICHAEL J TORCHIA
Semanoff, Ormsby, Greenberg & Torchia LLC
contact info

GPO Oct 16 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION RE: 6 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/15/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
GPO Oct 16 2024
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/15/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 02/05 12:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/5/25. 2/5/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Wed 12/04 11:15 AM
Letter dated December 4, 2024 regarding settlement by Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Robert J. Willard. (GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 9:42 AM
ORDER that if defendants do not file a response in this case on or before December 6, 2024, the Court will enter an order for Default Judgment for the plaintiff and against the defendants. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/2/24. 12/2/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE MERRITT PACARO on behalf of Barbara Lynn Vail with Certificate of Service(PACARO, JULIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/05 8:22 AM
STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 3/28/2025. MOTIONS DUE BY 6/16/2025.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 11/1/24. 11/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 10/30 5:51 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines in Matter by Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard.(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Supplement
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 10/16 8:37 AM
ORDER denying6 Motion to Dismiss. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/15/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
15 15 23 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 10/16 8:36 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION RE:6 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 10/15/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 07/26 8:57 AM
RESPONSE in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard. (LONGO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
13 13 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Mon 07/22 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY. Re: A Pretrial/Rule 16 Conference was held on 7/22/24. (fdc)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 11:14 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/2/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 12/16/2024.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/22/24. 7/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/16 6:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Barbara Lynn Vail. (TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 discov Discovery Plan Mon 07/15 10:47 AM
Discovery Plan by Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard.(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/02 10:58 AM
ORDER granting8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY RE8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ,6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint RESPONSES DUE BY 7/16/2024.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/2/24.7/2/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/01 6:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Barbara Lynn Vail.Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defs' Motion to Dismiss.(TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/24 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/22/2024 10:30 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 06/21 12:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH LONGO on behalf of Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard with Certificate of Service(LONGO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/21 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE K. GALLAGHER on behalf of Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/15 12:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Anne Arundel Dermatology Management Holdings LLC, Anne Arundel Dermatology Management LLC, Vincent Bradley, Dermatology and Mohs Surgery Center, P.C., Robert J. Willard. Forwarded To: Michael J. Torchia on 4/15/24 (fdc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/15 11:45 AM
NOTICE by Barbara Lynn Vail re Attorney Required Forms, Designation Form (TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 04/15 9:32 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No questions need to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 04/12 6:18 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17396720.), filed by Barbara Lynn Vail.(TORCHIA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]