Klumpp v. Washington County Courthouse et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brett H Ludwig |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00439 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Officer Delmore
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Jaeger
|
|
Defendant
Washington County Courthouse
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Klumpp
1120 3rd Avenue E., Apt 8
Ashland, WI 54806 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 05/02 3:49 PM
OBJECTION to7 Report and Recommendations filed by plaintiff Michael Klumpp(vkb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Thu 05/02 3:48 PM
LETTER from plaintiff requesting that the court order Washington County to provide him with his state court trial transcript(vkb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendations ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/23 9:50 AM
(continued from ECF No. 6 ) RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/23/2024 re1 Complaint - Pro Se filed by Michael Klumpp. It is recommended that plaintiff's complaint and this action be dismissed. Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm) |
|
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 04/23 9:35 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/23/2024 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 04/22 9:51 AM
LETTER from Michael Klumpp regarding his case and asking about copies of transcripts in his Washington County case.(mlm) |
|
Att: 1 Response by Clerk's Office | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 9:48 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Klumpp. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Fri 04/12 1:25 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mlm) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Fri 04/12 1:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michael Klumpp. (mlm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Fri 04/12 1:06 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Officer Delmore, Jeff Jaeger, Washington County Courthouse filed by Michael Klumpp. Jury Demand(mlm) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 04/12 1:11 PM
Docket Annotation : Previous Case 22cv166 (mlm) |