California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-00815
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Julie Le
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Anh Tran
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Skybox Holdings 81
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Proficient Profits
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tommy Le
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Devon Julian
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chris Francy
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Christina D'Angelo
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Culture Cannabis Club
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bloomstone
Represented By
Jeremy J Osher
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Aaron Michael Gladstein
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Steven Frederick Kuehl
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Stephen Z Boren
Boren Osher And Luftman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Melendez
Represented By
Courtney Wenrick
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
John C. Kang
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bikramjit Singh Pannu
Represented By
Courtney Wenrick
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
John C. Kang
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ranjeet Pannu
Represented By
Courtney Wenrick
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
John C. Kang
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, June 24, 2024
25 25 order Dismiss Case Mon 06/24 10:43 AM
ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting Voluntary19 . The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(b)(6) (Dkt.19) is denied as moot. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
24 24 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 06/21 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez. Dismissal is without prejudice.(Kang, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Dismissal without Prejudice
23 23 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Fri 06/21 12:29 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))21 by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken. Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Motion to dismiss pending. (twdb)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 06/21 10:28 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Motion to dismiss pending. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
21 21 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 06/20 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
20 20 misc For Judicial Notice Tue 06/11 1:06 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(b)(6) 19 filed by Defendants Bloomstone, Culture Cannabis Club, Christina D'Angelo, Chris Francy, Devon Julian, Julie Le, Tommy Le, Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc., Proficient Profits, Skybox Holdings 81, Anh Tran. (Osher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Case Tue 06/11 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Bloomstone, Culture Cannabis Club, Christina D'Angelo, Chris Francy, Devon Julian, Julie Le, Tommy Le, Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc., Proficient Profits, Skybox Holdings 81, Anh Tran. Motion set for hearing on 7/15/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Bloomstone(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Culture Cannabis Club(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Christina D'Angelo(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Chris Francy(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Devon Julian(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Julie Le(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Tommy Le(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Proficient Profits(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Skybox Holdings 81(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Anh Tran(pty:dft)) (Osher, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROC. 12(b)(6),
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Friday, May 03, 2024
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 05/03 4:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bloomstone answer now due 6/12/2024; Christina D'Angelo answer now due 6/12/2024; Devon Julian answer now due 6/12/2024; Julie Le answer now due 6/12/2024; Tommy Le answer now due 6/12/2024; Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc. answer now due 6/12/2024; Skybox Holdings 81 answer now due 6/12/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Melendez; Ranjeet Pannu; Bikramjit Singh Pannu.(Kang, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 05/03 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),15 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),13 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),14 . The following error(s) was/were found: The proof of service was not served pursuant to FRCP 5(b)(2)(D). The clerks office was not served and is not a party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 5:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Christina D'Angelo served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 5:07 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Devon Julian served on 4/24/2024, answer due 5/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 5:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Tommy Le served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 5:01 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Skybox Holdings 81 served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 5:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 4:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Bloomstone served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 05/02 4:50 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Benjamin Melendez, Ranjeet Pannu, Bikramjit Singh Pannu, upon Defendant Julie Le served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/12 3:02 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Bloomstone, Culture Cannabis Club, Christina D'Angelo, Chris Francy, Devon Julian, Julie Le, Tommy Le, Mammoth Legend Consulting, Inc., Proficient Profits, Skybox Holdings 81, Anh Tran. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 04/12 2:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 04/12 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Fri 04/12 2:46 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:24-cv-00815-DOC-ADSx. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
4 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BENJAMIN MELENDEZ, BIKRAMJIT SINGH PANNU, RANJEET PANNU, (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff BENJAMIN MELENDEZ, BIKRAMJIT SINGH PANNU, RANJEET PANNU. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BENJAMIN MELENDEZ, BIKRAMJIT SINGH PANNU, RANJEET PANNU. (Kang, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37264554 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff BIKRAMJIT SINGH PANNU, RANJEET PANNU, BENJAMIN MELENDEZ. (Attorney John C. Kang added to party BENJAMIN MELENDEZ(pty:pla), Attorney John C. Kang added to party BIKRAMJIT SINGH PANNU(pty:pla), Attorney John C. Kang added to party RANJEET PANNU(pty:pla))(Kang, John)
Related: [-]