Spector v. Progressive Urgent Care, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas S Hixson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02169 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 1:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
Progressive Urgent Care, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Paul Spector
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/23 12:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paul Spector. Progressive Urgent Care, Inc. served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024. (Clefton, Aaron) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/15 2:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Paul Spector (Clefton, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 2:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Spector.. (Clefton, Aaron) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 12:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Progressive Urgent Care, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 10:03 AM
Proposed Summons. (Clefton, Aaron) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 04/12 3:35 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/12 2:59 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/12 3:37 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file the document with the correct defendant in the caption. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Paul Spector. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Clefton, Aaron) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Progressive Urgent Care, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19312430.). Filed by Paul Spector.(Clefton, Aaron) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |