Ziegler v. Safety Specialty Insurance Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02210 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Safety Specialty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Ziegler
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 04/30 11:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 11:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Safety Specialty Insurance Company.. (Pardini, Julian) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/16 7:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safety Specialty Insurance Company re4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Pardini, Julian) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 04/16 7:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safety Specialty Insurance Company re2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Removal Complaint (Pardini, Julian) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 12:19 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/15 8:18 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/29/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/12 8:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Safety Specialty Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, (Pardini, Julian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/12 8:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-612951. (). Filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company.(Pardini, Julian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court | ||
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:13 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint Document 1-2 pages 2 of 8 by Safety Specialty Insurance Company's. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |