L. v. County of Trinity et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02211 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 1:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Connie Cessna-Smith
|
|
Defendant
County of Trinity
|
|
Defendant
Joshua Ford
|
|
Defendant
Linda Kroner
|
|
Defendant
Michael Novak
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Robbins
|
|
Defendant
Tim Saxon
|
|
Defendant
Marcus Treanor
|
|
Defendant
Ron Whitman
|
|
Plaintiff
S. L.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/18 4:23 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024, 11:00 AM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 04/18 4:17 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . INCOMPLETE PROPOSED SUMMONS: Defendants to be served must be listed on the proposed summons (To: (Defendants name and address)). Additional defendants can be listed on an addendum page to the proposed summons. [err102] Please re-file in its entirety. Re:5 Proposed Summons filed by S. L. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/17 10:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/17 2:13 AM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed by S. L..(Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Successor in Interest Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 4:33 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by S. L. Per Request of Clerk . (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
utility
Remark
Mon 04/15 10:41 AM
INTAKE CALLED FILER TO VERIFY IF THE COMPLAINT SHOULD BE FILED IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT AND UNABLE TO OPEN CIVIL COVER SHEET AS IT APPEARS TO BE A DAMAGED FILE. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/15 3:59 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . CASE SUBMITTED TO WRONG DISTRICT, SHOULD BE FILED IN EASTERN DISTRICT. CASE WILL BE CLOSED. Re:1 Complaint filed by S. L. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 11:59 PM
Proposed Summons. (Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:53 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19317605.). Filed by S. L..(Schmidt, Sanjay) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |