John Couch v. USA, et al
Original Case: 1:24-cv-00030
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01565 |
Type | civil / us |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, Attn: Representative Andre Carson and/or Representative Greg Pence
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS AND MARION COUNTY, a/k/a UNIGOV a/k/a THE CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS UNIGOV MARION COUNTY INDIANA; Attn: Mayor Joe Hogsett
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF INDIANA, Attn: Governor Eric Holcomb
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES SENATE, Attn: Senator Mike Braun and/or Senator Todd Young
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN L. COUCH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 3:17 AM CDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant John L. Couch by 04/12/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/23/2024. [1] [7375221] 24-1565 (MAN) [Entered: 04/10/2024 09:23 AM] | |
Att: 1 175 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7375227] (Note: The Office of the US Attorney, Office of the IN Attorney General & Office of Corporation Counsel for Indianapolis have been notified of the filing of the appeal.) 24-1565 (MAN) [Entered: 04/10/2024 09:41 AM] |