Garcia v. Jasso Posada
Original Case: 3:24-cv-00360
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-pcf-10319 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Arlette Valeria Jasso Posada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Nestor Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:24-CV-360. Electronic ROA due on 04/26/2024. 24-10319 (CAS) | ||
3 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Arlette Valeria Jasso Posada 24-10319 (LEF) | ||
2 pgs LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of monitored status 24-10319 (LEF) | ||
4 pgs INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [8] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. 24-10319 (CAS) |