Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. v. David Martin
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03540
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01579 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:19 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
DAVID MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 3:15 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant David Martin by 04/17/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/25/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/21/2024 for David Martin. [1] [7375584] 24-1579 (MAN) [Entered: 04/11/2024 11:41 AM] | |
Att: 1 74 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs ORDER: The court, on its own motion, orders that these appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/21/2024 for David Martin. Appellee's brief due on or before 06/20/2024 for Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/11/2024 for Appellant David Martin. JXK [2] [7375616] 24-1296 24-1579 (HTP) [Entered: 04/11/2024 12:38 PM] | |
3 | 3 3 pgs Notice of Circuit Rule 33 mediation issued. The mediation will be conducted by phone, Tuesday, April 30, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. See Notice for further details and requirements. RJS. [3] [7375718] 24-1296 24-1579 (ER) [Entered: 04/11/2024 04:12 PM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs ORDER: Pursuant to Circuit Rule 33, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 05/30/2024 for David Martin. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/01/2024 for Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 07/22/2024 for Appellant David Martin. RJS [7375719] 24-1296 24-1579 (ER) [Entered: 04/11/2024 04:18 PM] |