Artevyr KIAB LLC v. Italic, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02813 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Italic, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Artevyr KIAB LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service Other
Fri 04/26 4:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference; Judge Woods' Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases served on Italic, Inc. on April 25, 2024. Service was accepted by Andrew Purdy, Esq.. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Artevyr KIAB LLC..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 04/25 12:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Tammy Girardi, Telos Legal Corp.. Document filed by Artevyr KIAB LLC..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/16 11:42 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(B) of the Court's Individual Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/16/2024) (rro) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Italic, Inc...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 11:54 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 11:54 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 11:54 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 11:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stella L. Sainty. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $325,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $325,000;. (pc) |
||
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sat 04/13 8:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Italic, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Artevyr KIAB LLC..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sat 04/13 7:51 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Artevyr KIAB LLC..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sat 04/13 6:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 04/13 12:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Italic, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29215801)Document filed by Artevyr KIAB LLC..(Sainty, Stella) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Italic POs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Italic Inventory replenishment orders, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Italic 2023 payout statement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Artevyr records of Italic Inventory on hand |