Hall v. Vataj
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02817 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sonny Vataj
689 Bedford Road
Armonk, NY 10504 |
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Hall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 04/17 4:02 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, and the time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/17/2024) (vfr) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 7:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 2:42 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sonny Vataj..(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/15 2:04 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/15 2:04 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/15 2:04 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 04/15 2:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 2:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Jury demand was marked yes and no;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc) |
||
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 04/14 10:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sun 04/14 10:11 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sonny Vataj, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/14 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Sonny Vataj. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number CNYSDC-29216024)Document filed by Nancy Hall..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Op Agr |