Spence v. SAND KASTLE, LLLP
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David S Leibowitz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60594 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
SAND KASTLE, LLLP
|
|
Plaintiff
Garfield Spence
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 12:44 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garfield Spence. SAND KASTLE, LLLP served on 4/19/2024, response/answer due 5/10/2024. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to SAND KASTLE, LLLP. (kpe) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 9:37 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/14 6:56 PM
COMPLAINT against SAND KASTLE, LLLP. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17446006, filed by Garfield Spence.(Leal, Alberto) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |