Spence v. 905 SUNRISE LANE LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William P Dimitrouleas |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-60595 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
905 SUNRISE LANE LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Garfield Spence
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 11:46 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garfield Spence. 905 Sunrise Lane LLC served on 4/17/2024, response/answer due 5/8/2024. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Tue 04/16 4:26 PM
First RESPONSE to order Requiring Verified Certificate of Counsel by Garfield Spence. (Leal, Alberto) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Tue 04/16 4:07 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT: Within thirty-five (35) calendar days of the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, unless this action is excluded under Rule 26(a)(1)(B), the parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Order pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B.2. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/16 4:05 PM
ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's counsel shall file with the Clerk of the Court the verified statement responding to the questions promulgated above on or before April 22, 2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to 905 Sunrise Lane LLC. (wce) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 8:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/14 7:05 PM
COMPLAINT against 905 SUNRISE LANE LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17446010, filed by Garfield Spence.(Leal, Alberto) |
|
Att: 1 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |