Ferreira de Souza et al v. U.S. Secretary of State et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00904 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
ANTONY J. BLINKEN
|
|
Defendant
CARSON WU
|
|
Plaintiff
RODRIGO LUIZ FERREIRA DE SOUZA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ISE CAROLINY LIMA DE SOUZA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 11:12 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/26 11:11 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Tue 04/23 12:13 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Rodrigo Luiz Ferreira de Souza, Ise Caroliny Lima de Souza. Director of Screening, Analysis, and Coordination served on 4/19/2024, answer due 6/18/2024; U.S. Secretary of State served on 4/19/2024, answer due 6/18/2024.(Lemakos, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - C | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued as to USA
Wed 04/17 4:21 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Director of Screening, Analysis, and Coordination, U.S. Secretary of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RLK) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 04/16 12:40 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew James Lemakos of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/15 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew James Lemakos on behalf of Rodrigo Luiz Ferreira de Souza, Ise Caroliny Lima de Souza. Lead Counsel: Matthew J. Lemakos. (Lemakos, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed summons
Mon 04/15 3:52 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Rodrigo Luiz Ferreira de Souza, Ise Caroliny Lima de Souza. (Lemakos, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/15 2:50 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew James Lemakos of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/15 10:06 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-904-TPB-AAS. (RLK) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/14 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus against ANTONY J. BLINKEN, CARSON WU (Filing fee $405 receipt number BFLMDC-21979900) filed by RODRIGO LUIZ FERREIRA DE SOUZA, ISE CAROLINY LIMA DE SOUZA.(Lemakos, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A 221(g) Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B April 7, 2024 Declaration of Defendant Wu, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C CEAC Online Case Status, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D March 18, 2024 Rio to Rubio Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E February 20, 2024 "before a determination", | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons |