SHM Loch Lomond, LLC v. That Certain 1947 Chris Craft Motor Yacht of Approximately 46-Feet In Length, U.S. Coast Guard Official No. 255464, And All Of Her Engines, Tackle, Accessories, Equipment, Furnishings And Appurtenance
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02215 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
That Certain 1947 Chris Craft Motor Yacht of Approximately 46-Feet In Length, U.S. Coast Guard Official No. 255464, And All Of Her Engines, Tackle, Accessories, Equipment, Furnishings And Appurtenance
|
|
Plaintiff
SHM Loch Lomond, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 10:05 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC.. (Weiss, Philip) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/16 1:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC [Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons] (Weiss, Philip) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/16 1:39 PM
NOTICE by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC re5 Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem [Ex Parte Application For Order Authorizing Issuance of a Warrant For Arrest of Defendant Vessel] ,7 Ex Parte Application [Ex Parte Application For Appointment of Substitute Custodian and For Authorization For Movement of Defendant Vessel] [Notice of Request For Review In Accordance With F.R.C.P. Supplemental Admiralty Rule C] (Weiss, Philip) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Warrant in rem
Tue 04/16 1:34 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem [Warrant For Action In Rem] filed by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC. (Weiss, Philip) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Ex Parte Application
Tue 04/16 1:30 PM
Ex Parte Application [Ex Parte Application For Appointment of Substitute Custodian and For Authorization For Movement of Defendant Vessel] filed by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC.(Weiss, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration [Declaration of Patrick Lopez In Support of Application For Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Authorizing Movement of Defendant Vessel], | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian and Authorizing Movement of Defendant Vessels] | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to That Certain 1947 Chris Craft Motor Yacht of Approximately 46-Feet In Length, U.S. Coast Guard Official No. 255464 (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Warrant in rem
Tue 04/16 1:14 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem [Ex Parte Application For Order Authorizing Issuance of a Warrant For Arrest of Defendant Vessel] filed by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC.(Weiss, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration [Declaration of Philip E. Weiss In Support of Ex Parte Application For Order Authorizing Issuance Of A Warrant For Arrest Of Defendant Vessel], | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [Proposed Order Authorizing Issuance of Warrant For Arrest of Defendant Vessel] | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/16 1:14 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 9:18 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Saturday, April 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Sat 04/13 6:19 PM
Proposed Summons. (Weiss, Philip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 04/13 6:02 PM
COMPLAINT against That Certain 1947 Chris Craft Motor Yacht of Approximately 46-Feet In Length, U.S. Coast Guard Official No. 255464, And All Of Her Engines, Tackle, Accessories, Equipment, Furnishings And Appurtenance ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19317706.). Filed by SHM Loch Lomond, LLC.(Weiss, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit [Exhibit A to Verified Complaint For Vessel Arrest, Interlocutory Sale And For Money Damages For Breach of Maritime Contract, Quantum Meruit, And Trespass], | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |