Abdisamatova v. Mayorkas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02216 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Andrew Davidson
|
|
Defendant
Matthew Emrich
|
|
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Ted Kim
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Defendant
San Francisco Asylum Office
|
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS)
|
|
Plaintiff
Zebo Abdisamatova
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 07/08 2:38 PM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 21 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 07/05 3:11 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS). (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 06/25 11:43 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time within which Defendants Must File a Response signed by Magistrate Jude Alex G. Tse: granting 19 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 06/24 3:16 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS). (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/24 3:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS).. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/24 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
14 | 14
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
13 | 13
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:06 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 06/18 6:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 05/15 1:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/29/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 04/17 1:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/17 11:50 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Zebo Abdisamatova (Minas, Arthur) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/17 11:43 AM
Proposed Summons. (Minas, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Tue 04/16 9:31 AM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/16 9:27 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/14 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Andrew Davidson, Matthew Emrich, Ur Jaddou, Ted Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, San Francisco Asylum Office, United States Citizenship and Immigration Service (USCIS) ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19317826.). Filed by Zebo Abdisamatova.(Minas, Arthur) Modified on 4/14/2024 (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit |