Matthew Peterson v. Thomas Dart, et al
Original Case: 1:22-cv-00023
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01585 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS J. DART
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DARRYL HOUSTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HUGH WALSH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STANLEY ACOVELLI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES MORRISON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MATTHEW PETERSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Matthew Peterson by 04/17/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/25/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/21/2024 for Matthew Peterson. [1] [7375858] 24-1585 (CG) [Entered: 04/12/2024 11:02 AM] | |
Att: 1 25 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court | ||
2 | 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Jane Doe, John Doe, Sandoval, Palermo. [2] [7375865] 24-1585 (CG) [Entered: 04/12/2024 11:16 AM] |