Na'Im Anderson v. Baltimore County, Maryland
Original Case: 1:23-cv-01842
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01314 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BALTIMORE COUNTY, MARYLAND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STATE OF MARYLAND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OFFICE OF THE STATE'S ATTORNEY FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS WOLFERMAN, in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHAD A. SHOLTER, in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NA'IM ANDERSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-01842-JKB. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001551588] 24-1314 EB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:25 AM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-01842-JKB. [1001551607] 24-1314 EB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:45 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001551616] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/22/2024. Response Brief due 06/21/2024. 24-1314 EB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:51 AM] |