Brandy Calhoun v. Commissioner of Social Security
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00054
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.ss-01315 |
Type | civil social security / united states |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRANDY MICHELLE CALHOUN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Social Security case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00054-GCM. Date notice of appeal filed: 04/09/2024. Case manager: TBarton. [1001551596] 24-1315 TB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:37 AM] | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1001551596-2] social security case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00054-GCM. [1001551598] 24-1315 TB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:38 AM] | |
2 | 2 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD requested (counseled cases) . Was administrative record filed in electronic form in district court? Yes. [1001551601] Administrative Record (Social Security) due 04/26/2024. 24-1315 TB [Entered: 04/12/2024 09:40 AM] |