Cortland Shields, Jr. v. Verizon Maryland, LLC
Original Case: 1:23-cv-02932
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01317 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
VERIZON MARYLAND, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CORTLAND A. SHIELDS, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-02932-JMC. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001551768] 24-1317 RP [Entered: 04/12/2024 12:12 PM] | |
2 | 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-02932-JMC. [1001551772] 24-1317 RP [Entered: 04/12/2024 12:15 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001551775] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/22/2024. Response Brief due 06/21/2024 24-1317 RP [Entered: 04/12/2024 12:16 PM] |