Virgil Kelley v. Martin O'Malley
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00285
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01587 |
Type | civil / us / social security |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MARTIN J. O'MALLEY, Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
VIRGIL L. KELLEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 3:15 AM CDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 04/26/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/22/2024 for Virgil L. Kelley. [1] [7375883] 24-1587 (ER) [Entered: 04/12/2024 11:49 AM] | |
Att: 1 28 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |