Castro v. Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodolfo A Ruiz, II |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-21391 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 8:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC.
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301 |
|
Plaintiff
Arantza Castro
P.O. Box 228630
Doral, FL 33222 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 04/16 12:14 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 4/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (gp) |
|
utility
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/16 12:16 PM
Civil Case Closed for Administrative purposes only. See4 Order Consolidating Cases. (gp) |
||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 04/16 12:19 PM
Cases associated. Lead Case No. 1:24-cv-21389-RAR. (gp) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 4:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC.. (nan) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 04/15 4:02 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 7:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Saks Fifth Avenue, LLC.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17446139, filed by Arantza Castro.(Mendez, Diego) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s) |