MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL v. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | John D Bates |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01066 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
|
|
Defendant
LINA M. KHAN
|
|
Plaintiff
MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/30 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Feldman on behalf of MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL (Feldman, Brett) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 04/30 12:20 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 29, 2024.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Brett M. Feldman, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Brett M. Feldman, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Brett M. Feldman | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Thu 04/25 8:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/24/2024.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Brett M. Feldman, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Feldman Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Feldman Declaration | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 04/22 2:47 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service
Thu 04/18 8:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. LINA M. KHAN waiver sent on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/15/2024. (Boyle, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service
Thu 04/18 5:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION waiver sent on 4/15/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (Boyle, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Tue 04/16 11:25 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Issue | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 8:31 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN.(znmw) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 8:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (znmw) |
||
notice
Notice of Error- New Case
Tue 04/16 8:31 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Complaint,. The following error(s) need correction: Missing summonses- U.S. government. When naming a U.S. government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 12:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of3 Andrew B. Sacks's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice and4 Brett M. Feldman's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/16/2024. (lcjdb2) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brett M. Feldman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10828668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brett M. Feldman, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/15 11:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew B. Sacks, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10827730. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew B. Sacks, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 04/15 11:14 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL (Boyle, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, LINA M. KHAN ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10827470) filed by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL.(Boyle, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Summons to FTC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons to Lina M. Khan |