4
|
|
4
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/15/2024. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/29/2024 ., Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2024 and every 30 days thereafter., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2024 ., Discovery due by 8/13/2024 . (kdm)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. (EISENLOHR-MOUL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service, Inc. from FOURTEENTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, case number 24-CA-000182. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8765937.), filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (EISENLOHR-MOUL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit,
|
| |
Att: 2
Civil Cover Sheet
|