Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:24-cv-00502
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 4:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Antioch University
Represented By
Rachael A Curtis
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
David W Silke
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Plaintiff
J Leslie Elliott
Represented By
O. Shane Balloun
Balloun Law Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/15 9:14 AM
***Civil Case Terminated, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and (B), per Parties'9 Stipulation of Dismissal. (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 08/14 11:46 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by parties (Balloun, O. Shane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 misc Joint Status Report Wed 07/17 4:43 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6-8. (Silke, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/14 2:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Antioch University.(Curtis, Rachael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
6 6 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 06/12 3:06 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 7/17/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/26/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/10/2024. (AD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 05/03 4:35 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Antioch University. (Curtis, Rachael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael A Curtis on behalf of Defendant Antioch University. (Curtis, Rachael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/03 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David W Silke on behalf of Defendant Antioch University. (Silke, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Fri 04/19 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Antioch University mailed on 4/18/2024 (Balloun, O. Shane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 04/18 11:44 AM
Judge John H. Chun added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/15 7:59 AM
COMPLAINT for Intentional Discrimination in Violation of Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, Breach of Contract, and Defamation against defendant(s) J Leslie Elliott with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by J Leslie Elliott.(Balloun, O. Shane)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8429394
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet