Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:24-cv-01090
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Habeas Corpus: INS
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:36 AM EDT
Petitioner
Miguel Arevalo Quintero
Represented By
Frederick Evan Benz
Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
contact info
Ian Austin Rose
Cair Coalition
contact info
Respondent
Merrick B. Garland
Represented By
Vickie LeDuc
Us Attorney Office
contact info
Respondent
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Vickie LeDuc
Us Attorney Office
contact info
Respondent
Darius Reeves
Represented By
Vickie LeDuc
Us Attorney Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/03 9:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Miguel Arevalo Quintero, Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Darius Reeves(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 05/03 11:19 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving notice of voluntary dismissal and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 5/3/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Show Cause Fri 05/03 11:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot9 Motion for Order to Show Cause in light of13 . Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 5/3/2024. (lmys, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/26 4:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Miguel Arevalo Quintero.(Benz, Frederick)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/26 12:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Darius Reeves.(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/26 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Darius Reeves (LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
9 9 motion Show Cause Thu 04/25 3:25 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Miguel Arevalo Quintero(Benz, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 04/22 9:09 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frederick Evan Benz by Miguel Arevalo Quintero. The fee has already been paid.(Rose, Ian)
Related: [-]
order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/22 10:21 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting7 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of F. Evan Benz. Directing attorney F. Evan Benz to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Signatures Wed 04/17 11:40 AM
QC NOTICE:4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Miguel Arevalo Quintero needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 04/16 9:14 AM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Darius Reeves, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/15 5:35 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Frederick Evan Benz (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11204867.) by Miguel Arevalo Quintero(Rose, Ian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/15 5:29 PM
NOTICE by Miguel Arevalo Quintero re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Proposed Summons(Rose, Ian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Reeves,
Att: 2 Summons Mayorkas,
Att: 3 Summons Garland,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Attorney
2 2 QC NOTICE:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miguel Arevalo Quintero was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 04/15 11:59 AM
PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF , filed by Miguel Arevalo Quintero.(Rose, Ian) Modified on 4/15/2024 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/15 2:57 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Pay Civil Filing Fee Mon 04/15 3:01 PM
The case of Arevalo Quintero v. Reeves, et al , has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is DLB 24-cv-1090 . PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours . To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents . Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Civil Case Filing Fee Mon 04/15 5:10 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number AMDDC-11204841(Rose, Ian)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 04/15 3:03 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miguel Arevalo Quintero was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to 1 . (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]