New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Referred: Judith C Mccarthy
Case #: 7:24-cv-02830
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2024 6:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Chappaqua Central School District
66 Roaring Brook Road
Chappaqua, NY 10514
Represented By
Stanislav Sharovskiy
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education
Represented By
Stanislav Sharovskiy
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Christine Ackerman
Represented By
Stanislav Sharovskiy
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Sandra Sepe
Represented By
Stanislav Sharovskiy
Silverman & Associates
contact info
Lewis R. Silverman
Silverman And Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
O. J.
Represented By
David W. Rubin
The Foundation For Individual Rights And Expression
contact info
Alanna Gayle Kaufman
contact info
Colin McDonell
Foundation For Individual Rights And Expression
contact info
Greg Harold Greubel
Foundation For Individual Rights And Expression
contact info
Alyssa Diane Isidoridy
Kaufman, Lieb, Lebowitz & Frick LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
92 92 order Memo Endorsement Tue 05/13 3:07 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:91 Status Report filed by Christine Ackerman, Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education, Chappaqua Central School District, Sandra Sepe. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to notify the Court by June 5, 2025 whether the Board of Education approved the settlement agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/13/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
91 91 misc Status Report Mon 05/12 4:05 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Christine Ackerman, Chappaqua Central School District, Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education, Sandra Sepe..(Silverman, Lewis)
Related: [-]