O.J. v. Chappaqua Central School District et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02830 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 12:12 PM EDT |
ADR Provider
Sandra Sepe
|
|
Defendant
Christine Ackerman
|
|
Defendant
Chappaqua Central School District
66 Roaring Brook Road
Chappaqua, NY 10514 |
|
Defendant
Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education
|
|
Plaintiff
O. J.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 11:24 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Sandra Sepe served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Sandra Sepe. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 11:18 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Christine Ackerman served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Christine Ackerman. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 11:09 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Liisa Elsner. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/18 11:07 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Chappaqua Central School District served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024. Service was accepted by Liisa Elsner. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna Gayle Kaufman on behalf of O. J...(Kaufman, Alanna) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against Christine Ackerman, Chappaqua Central School District, Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education, Sandra Sepe. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 10:05 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandra Sepe. (vf) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 10:04 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christine Ackerman. (vf) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 10:04 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education. (vf) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 10:03 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chappaqua Central School District. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 04/16 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alyssa Diane Isidoridy to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. The pleading was not signed by the ECF Filing Attorney user. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 04/16 9:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alyssa Diane Isidoridy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/16 9:53 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 9:53 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 9:53 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 12:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sandra Sepe, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 12:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christine Ackerman, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 12:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 12:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chappaqua Central School District, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 12:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment | ||
1 | 1
46
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Christine Ackerman, Chappaqua Central School District, Chappaqua Central School District Board of Education, Sandra Sepe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29218432)Document filed by O. J...(Isidoridy, Alyssa) |