|
|
badmin
Recommendation re: Motion (No Objection - BA)
Mon 04/29 2:30 PM
Recommendation Regarding Motion (No Objection) [bcb] filed by Brian Behr on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator Related [+]. (Behr, Brian)
|
|
|
badmin
Intake Notice Sent
Fri 04/26 6:05 PM
The Intake Notice has been sent by the Bankruptcy Administrator filed by Brian Behr on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Behr, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Fri 04/26 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/25/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
20
|
|
20
audio
Tue 04/23 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/23/2024 01:04:12 PM]. File Size [ 7367 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:43 ]. (11(a) Status Conference). (admin)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
order
Regarding Status Conference
Tue 04/23 1:26 PM
Order Regarding Status Conference Related [+]. (Angel, Sharon)
|
18
|
|
18
misc
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/22 9:43 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory P. Chocklett on behalf of Radiance Capital Receivables Eighteen LLC. (Chocklett, Gregory)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar
Mon 04/22 7:48 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to 4/23/2024 Calendar Related [+] (Angel, Sharon)
|
17
|
|
17
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Sat 04/20 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/19/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
16
|
|
16
misc
SubChapter V Pre-Conference Report
Fri 04/19 4:22 PM
SubChapter V Pre-Conference Report filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Fri 04/19 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/18/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
14
|
|
14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/18 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/17/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
|
13
|
|
13
misc
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by George M. Oliver on behalf of Buckmiller, Boyette & Frost, PLLC. (Oliver, George)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
order
File Plan & Setting Status Conf. (SubChapter V)
Wed 04/17 9:33 AM
Order to File Plan and Notice of Status Conference (SubChapter V) Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/15/2024. Status hearing to be held on 4/23/2024 at 01:00 PM at Telephone Conference/Judge Callaway. (Angel, Sharon)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/16 9:14 AM
Affidavit of DISINTERESTED PARTIES filed by Jennifer K. Bennington on behalf of Jennifer K. Bennington. (Bennington, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Regarding Administration of Estate (Ch. 11)
Tue 04/16 7:00 AM
Order Regarding Administration of Estate. (adi)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
plan
Chapter 11 Plan
Mon 04/15 6:08 PM
Chapter 11 Plan filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
utility
Calendar - Schedule
Mon 04/15 3:46 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date 11(a) Status Conference (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Individual)
Mon 04/15 3:36 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Greenville 341 Meeting Room. Last day to file complaint is 7/15/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 8/14/2024. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
badmin
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Mon 04/15 3:06 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee filed by Brian Behr on behalf of Bankruptcy Administrator. (Behr, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
motion
Employ
Mon 04/15 12:24 PM
Application to Employ Richard P. Cook, PLLC as Attorney for the Debtor Recommendation due 4/29/2024 filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order
|
4
|
|
4
court
Request re: Debtor Electronic Notice
Mon 04/15 10:40 AM
Request to Decline Debtor Electronic Notice filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
misc
Certificate of Credit Counseling
Mon 04/15 10:40 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Statement of Social Security Number
Mon 04/15 10:40 AM
Statement of Debtor(s) Social Security Number filed by Richard Preston Cook on behalf of Thomas Roy Roberts. (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) AA
Mon 04/15 10:39 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition SubChapter V filed by Thomas Roy Roberts (Cook, Richard)
Related: [-]
|