Seidman v. Seven and Eight LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Rochon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02833 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 1:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Seven and Eight LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Helayne Seidman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/19 1:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Seven and Eight LLC served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Clerk. Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 04/16 12:47 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 4/16/2024) (jca) |
|
6 | 6
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Tue 04/16 11:24 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 10:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seven and Eight LLC. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 04/16 10:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/16 10:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 04/16 10:44 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Mon 04/15 12:48 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 04/15 12:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Seven and Eight LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/15 12:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Seven and Eight LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29218816)Document filed by Helayne Seidman..(Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photographs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Photographs |