Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:23-bk-70113

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 7:24-ap-07002
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Terminated:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC
Represented By
Blackjewel Liquidation Trust, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bluegrass Natural Resources, LLC
Represented By
Kevin W. Barrett
contact info

GPO Jul 30 2024
Memorandum Opinion Granting 42 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant David J. Beckman. (awd)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/20 2:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding 24-7002 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]