TRIANGLE EXPERIENCE GROUP, INC. v. MAX MINDS, LLC
Indiana Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James Patrick Hanlon |
Referred: | Mario Garcia |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00650 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Virginia Eastern, 1:23-cv-01797 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
MAX MINDS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TRIANGLE EXPERIENCE GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/15/2024 2:20 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | ||
1 | 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9286001.), filed by Triangle Experience Group, Inc..(Kelley, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Triangle Experience Group, Inc.. (Kelley, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Thursday, January 04, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Triangle Experience Group, Inc.. (Kelley, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Raighne Delaney on behalf of Triangle Experience Group, Inc. (Delaney, Raighne) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Daniel Caruso on behalf of Triangle Experience Group, Inc. (Caruso, Stephen) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Max Minds, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(dvanm) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Triangle Experience Group, Inc.. Max Minds, LLC waiver sent on 1/2/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Delaney, Raighne) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Belevetz on behalf of Max Minds, LLC (Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Monday, February 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by George A. Gasper and Certification of Local Counsel Timothy D. Belevetz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9369871. by Max Minds, LLC. (Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed George Andrew Gasper for Max Minds, LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 2/20/2024. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
11 | 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Max Minds, LLC. (Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
12 | 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Max Minds, LLC. (Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
13 | 13 20 pgs Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Max Minds, LLC.(Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
Notice of Correction re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | ||
14 | 14 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 12, 2024 re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
Set Deadline as to12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (wgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 Opposition to12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,13 Memorandum in Support filed by Triangle Experience Group, Inc..(Kelley, Richard) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Max Minds, LLC.(Belevetz, Timothy) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
Case transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | ||
17 | 17 Docketed in Error and Removed .(lcre, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 4/12/2024) (lcre, ). Modified on 4/12/2024 (lcre, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
18 | 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2024. Plaintiff appeared through Stephen Caruso and Richard Kelly. Defendant appeared through Timothy Belevetz and George Gasper. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction re12 argued and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Parties advised of settlement options. Order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Salters.) (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/15/2024.] | |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:23-cv-01797. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. | |
20 | 20 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA) | |
21 | 21 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) |