Zelesnik et al v. President Joe Biden et al
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Danny C Reeves |
Referred: | P So |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00053 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Pete Buttigieg
|
|
Defendant
CINCY PORT
|
|
Defendant
CLE RTA
|
|
Defendant
Steve Dasenbrock
|
|
Defendant
Judge Blau
|
|
Defendant
Judge Zalla
|
|
Defendant
Scott Kirby
|
|
Defendant
President Joe Biden
|
|
Defendant
Senator Chuck Schumer
|
|
Defendant
Senator J.D. Vance
|
|
Defendant
Senator Rand Paul
|
|
Defendant
USA Greyhound
|
|
Defendant
Dr. Lisa D. Wilson
|
|
Plaintiff
Paula Zelesnik
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 9:59 AM
ORDER: this matter remains DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on 04/16/2024.(SLG) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:35 AM
CORRESPONDENCE (per de 10 in case #20-cv-162-DLB), filed by Paula Zelesnik, pro se. (TBB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:32 AM
CORRESPONDENCE (per de 10 in case #20-cv-162-DLB) (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Paula Zelesnik, pro se. (TBB) |
|
misc
Conflict Check
Mon 04/15 11:36 AM
Conflict Check run. (TBB) |