United States v. Wells Fargo
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Max O Cogburn, Jr |
Referred: | Susan C Rodriguez |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-00049 |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on MC-Application Pursuant to 28:1782
Wed 04/17 3:33 PM
ORDER granting 1 Application Pursuant to 28 USC 1782. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 4/17/2024. (mek) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 3:23 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Motions referred to Susan C. Rodriguez:1 Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ef) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 04/15 11:08 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 by United States.(Beck, Gill) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Beck Declaration | ||
1 | 1
motion
MC-Application Pursuant to 28:1782
Mon 04/15 11:07 AM
Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 , filed by United States. Responses due by 4/29/2024 (Beck, Gill) |