Hennessy v. Hennessy et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Lincoln D Almond |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Alexus Dupont
|
|
Defendant
Jayme Hennessy
|
|
Defendant
Megan Hennessy
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrice Hennessy
1159 Main St
Pawtucket, RI 02903 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and Order
Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re:1 Complaint filed by Patrice Hennessy. Plaintiff is given leave to file an Amended Complaint by May 10, 2024 that remedies the deficiencies identified in this Order and complies with Rules 8 and 10 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to timely file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order will result in a recommendation for summary dismissal of this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 4/18/2024. (Noel, Jeannine) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 04/18 9:31 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/18 3:23 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to be filed by May 10, 2024. (Noel, Jeannine) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 12:06 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Mon 04/15 12:12 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 12:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Patrice Hennessy. (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Patrice Hennessy.(Hill, Cherelle) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |