Y.Z.P. Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-13582 |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 24, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Y.Z.P. Inc.
2561 SW 11th St
Miami, FL 33135-4809 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Wed 05/01 11:44 AM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Sub V Status Conference (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements
Tue 04/30 3:06 PM
Amended Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Declaration re Schedules,] Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
Att: 1 Local Form 4 | ||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/29 7:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements
Mon 04/29 4:55 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] [Fee Amount $34] Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
Att: 1 Local Form 4 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 04/29 4:58 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed([LINK 24-13582 LMI] ) [misc,schsia] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44135040. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
court
Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)
Fri 04/26 12:37 PM
Re- Notice of Chapter 11 SubchapterV Status Conference. Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2024 at 09:30 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 6:49 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 6:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 6:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/20 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/19 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/19 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/19 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/17 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC . |
|
21 | 21
court
Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)
Wed 04/17 2:13 PM
Re- Notice of Planning Conference |
|
20 | 20
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Wed 04/17 2:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Motion for Determination that the Debtor is a Single Asset Real Estate Bankruptcy Case; (B) Objection to Debtors Subchapter V Election; and (C) for Related Relief Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC [Part 1 of ECF #19]) Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2024 at 11:30 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Objection
Wed 04/17 12:43 PM
Objection to Debtor's Subchapter V Election (1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.) Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC [Part 2 of ECF #16] (Snipes, Jeanne) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2024 (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
18 | 18
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Wed 04/17 12:39 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 5/17/2024 at 10:30 AM at by U.S. Trustee TELECONFERENCE. To participate call 866-915-4419 passcode 6071331. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/16/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 6/24/2024. (Snipes, Jeanne) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing
Wed 04/17 8:53 AM
Order Scheduling Chapter 11 SubChapter V Planning Conference. . Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2024 at 10:00 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Motion
Wed 04/17 8:48 AM
Motion A) Motion for Determination that the Debtor is a Single Asset Real Estate Bankruptcy Case; (B) Objection to Debtors Subchapter V Election; and (C) for Related Relief Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Unavailability of Documents
Tue 04/16 5:27 PM
Statement of Unavailability of Documents Required for Small Business Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
notice
UST Notice Appointing Trustee
Tue 04/16 4:10 PM
Notice Appointing Maria Yip as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Gold, Dan) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Verified Statement | ||
13 | 13
misc
Equity Security Holders
Tue 04/16 2:51 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Amended Document
Tue 04/16 11:45 AM
Amended Document To Reflect #7. Describe debtor's business: check box "None of the above" Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. . (Schwitalla, James) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
Tue 04/16 9:50 AM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference . Status hearing to be held on 06/05/2024 at 01:30 PM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
10 | 10
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Tue 04/16 9:48 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2024 at 09:30 AM C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business
Tue 04/16 9:25 AM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
8 | 8
court
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 04/16 9:23 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 4/23/2024].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 4/23/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/29/2024. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/29/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/29/2024. Schedule D due 4/29/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/29/2024. Schedule G due 4/29/2024. Schedule H due 4/29/2024.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 4/29/2024.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 4/29/2024. [Incomplete Filings due by 4/29/2024]. (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response
Mon 04/15 9:39 PM
Response to (4 Application to Employ James Schwitalla as Attorney for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.) and Reservation of Rights Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/15 8:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Case Management Summary
Mon 04/15 8:18 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
4 | 4
11
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 04/15 8:16 PM
Application to Employ James Schwitalla as Attorney for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Mon 04/15 4:14 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Alexis S Read Filed by Creditor Benfam Holdings PR LLC. |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 04/15 2:31 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Y.Z.P. Inc.. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Mon 04/15 2:31 PM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 06/24/2024. (Schwitalla, James) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 04/15 2:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-13582 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A44063380. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |